THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:29:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 102 & 103-3401 Ridgeway Drive
The Way Medical Clinic
Mississauga ON L5L 0B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 444-5224
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Shokr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Shokr (CPSO#: 111129 )
Business Address: 2-5055 Plantation Pl
Mississauga ON L5M 6J3
2894445224
Business Address: 3401 Ridgeway Drive
The Way Medical Clinic
Unit 2
Mississauga Ontario L5L 5T3

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Shokr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 102 & 103-3401 Ridgeway Drive
The Way Medical Clinic
Mississauga ON L5L 0B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 444-5224
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Oct 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Shokr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Shokr (CPSO#: 111129 )
Business Address: 2-5055 Plantation Pl
Mississauga ON L5M 6J3
2894445224
Business Address: 3401 Ridgeway Drive
The Way Medical Clinic
Unit 2
Mississauga Ontario L5L 5T3

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Shokr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Mar 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 07 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tarek Shokr may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tarek Shokr may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2016