THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:59:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 214-6633 Highway 7 E
Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
Markham ON L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: 905-294-0029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LU YI CAO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cao (CPSO#: 111150 )
Business Address: (905) 294-2290

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 214-6633 Highway 7 E
Markham Medical Centre
Suite 214
Markham ON L3P 7P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 294-2290
Fax: 905-294-0029

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: LU YI CAO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Cao (CPSO#: 111150 )
Business Address: (905) 294-2290

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LU YI CAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LU YI CAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2016