THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:47:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-252-0551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Department of Medicine
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 203-6036 Rama Rd
Rama ON L3V 6H6
Phone: 705-325-3611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MACGILLIVRAY HOARE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hoare (CPSO#: 116855 ) Dr. M. MacGillivray (CPSO#: 111154 )
Business Address: 203-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
7057270551

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-252-0551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Department of Medicine
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 203-6036 Rama Rd
Rama ON L3V 6H6
Phone: 705-325-3611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MACGILLIVRAY HOARE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hoare (CPSO#: 116855 ) Dr. M. MacGillivray (CPSO#: 111154 )
Business Address: 203-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
7057270551

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN EMMA MACGILLIVRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACGILLIVRAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGAN EMMA MACGILLIVRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACGILLIVRAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2016