THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 277-7163 Yonge Street
Grand Optima Medical Clinic
Markham Ontario L3T 0C8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-597-5125
Fax: 289-807-0047
Address: 121-7163 Yonge Street
Optima Medical Cosmetic Clinic
Markham Ontario L3T 0C8
Phone: 9055971515
Fax: 9055975115

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dastmalchian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dastmalchian (CPSO#: 111175 )
Business Address: Suite 118
7163 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C6
(905) 597-6543
Business Address: 121-7163 Yonge St 647-982-3434

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, PERSIAN
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 277-7163 Yonge Street
Grand Optima Medical Clinic
Markham Ontario L3T 0C8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 905-597-5125
Fax: 289-807-0047
Address: 121-7163 Yonge Street
Optima Medical Cosmetic Clinic
Markham Ontario L3T 0C8
Phone: 9055971515
Fax: 9055975115

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dastmalchian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dastmalchian (CPSO#: 111175 )
Business Address: Suite 118
7163 Yonge Street
Thornhill Ontario L3T 0C6
(905) 597-6543
Business Address: 121-7163 Yonge St 647-982-3434

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYED KAZEM DASTMALCHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASTMALCHIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEYED KAZEM DASTMALCHIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASTMALCHIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2016