THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 339-1592
Fax: (519) 491-0680

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William P.M. Southcott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Southcott (CPSO#: 111188 )
Business Address: 481 London Rd
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3

Corporation Name: W. Peter Southcott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Mar 2025

Corporation Name: William P.M. Southcott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Feb 2023

Corporation Name: William P.M. Southcott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 481 London Road
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 339-1592
Fax: (519) 491-0680

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William P.M. Southcott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Southcott (CPSO#: 111188 )
Business Address: 481 London Rd
Sarnia ON N7T 4X3

Corporation Name: W. Peter Southcott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Mar 2025

Corporation Name: William P.M. Southcott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Feb 2023

Corporation Name: William P.M. Southcott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM PETER MATTHEW SOUTHCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTHCOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM PETER MATTHEW SOUTHCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTHCOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 04 Jan 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2016