THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:58:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Medical Clinic
1520 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 3B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-4457
Fax: (905) 597-4458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chan Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chan Chung (CPSO#: 111190 )
Business Address: 101 Medical Clinic
1520 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 3B9
(905) 597-4457

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Medical Clinic
1520 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 3B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 597-4457
Fax: (905) 597-4458

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chan Chung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chan Chung (CPSO#: 111190 )
Business Address: 101 Medical Clinic
1520 Steeles Avenue West
Vaughan Ontario L4K 3B9
(905) 597-4457

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATE CHAN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN CHUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATE CHAN CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2016