THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:39:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 2nd Street Southeast
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 363-2340
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117-1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Phone: 9058429735
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Takhar (CPSO#: 111193 )
Business Address: 80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1B7
Business Address: 39 2nd Street Southeast
South Bruce Grey Health Centre
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
(519) 363-2340

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 2nd Street Southeast
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 363-2340
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 117-1060 Speers Road
Oakville Ontario L6L 2X4
Phone: 9058429735
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Takhar (CPSO#: 111193 )
Business Address: 80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1B7
Business Address: 39 2nd Street Southeast
South Bruce Grey Health Centre
Chesley Ontario N0G 1L0
(519) 363-2340

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARANDEEP KAUR TAKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKHAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARANDEEP KAUR TAKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKHAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2016