THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:41:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Marie-Curie Pvt
Suite 300
Ottawa ON K1N 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-564-3950
Extension: 285
Fax: 613-564-6627
Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Riverside Hospital
Shirley E. Greenberg Women's Health Center
7th Floor
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: 613-738-8400 ext. 81725
Fax: 613-738-8504
Address: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
8th Floor
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8587
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Aug 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Delpero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Delpero (CPSO#: 111200 )
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
SEGWHC 7th floor
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1A2
613-738-8400 Extn: 81725
Business Address: 100 Marie-Curie Private
Suite 300
Ottawa Ontario K1N 9N3
613-564-3950 Extn: 285

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Marie-Curie Pvt
Suite 300
Ottawa ON K1N 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-564-3950
Extension: 285
Fax: 613-564-6627
Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Riverside Hospital
Shirley E. Greenberg Women's Health Center
7th Floor
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: 613-738-8400 ext. 81725
Fax: 613-738-8504
Address: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
8th Floor
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8587
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Aug 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Delpero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Delpero (CPSO#: 111200 )
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
SEGWHC 7th floor
Ottawa Ontario K1H 1A2
613-738-8400 Extn: 81725
Business Address: 100 Marie-Curie Private
Suite 300
Ottawa Ontario K1N 9N3
613-564-3950 Extn: 285

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY ANNE DELPERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELPERO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY ANNE DELPERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELPERO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2016