THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:48:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 979-7700
Fax: (519) 979-8176
Address: 273 Main Street East
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 3S9
Phone: 226-526-5559
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Sleiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sleiman (CPSO#: 111212 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13278 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 3T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 979-7700
Fax: (519) 979-8176
Address: 273 Main Street East
Kingsville Ontario N9Y 3S9
Phone: 226-526-5559
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Sleiman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sleiman (CPSO#: 111212 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Sep 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 27 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nicholas Sleiman may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Nicholas Sleiman may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 May 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2016