THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:54:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeview FHT
80 Catherine St
Trenton Ontario K8V 6N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-394-0770
Fax: No Information Available
Address: QHC - Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King St
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
Phone: (613) 392-2540
Fax: (613) 392-2489

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DeGrace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. DeGrace (CPSO#: 111235 )
Business Address: 242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
(613) 392-2540
Business Address: 290 Dundas Street West
Suite 3
Trenton Ontario K8V 3R9
(613) 955-0707
Business Address: Brighton Quinte West FHT
80 Catherine Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 6N8
(613) 394-0770

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeview FHT
80 Catherine St
Trenton Ontario K8V 6N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-394-0770
Fax: No Information Available
Address: QHC - Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King St
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
Phone: (613) 392-2540
Fax: (613) 392-2489

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial Trenton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health Care Trenton Memorial
LOCATION: Trenton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DeGrace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. DeGrace (CPSO#: 111235 )
Business Address: 242 King Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 5S6
(613) 392-2540
Business Address: 290 Dundas Street West
Suite 3
Trenton Ontario K8V 3R9
(613) 955-0707
Business Address: Brighton Quinte West FHT
80 Catherine Street
Trenton Ontario K8V 6N8
(613) 394-0770

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JONATHAN DEGRACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEGRACE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID JONATHAN DEGRACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEGRACE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2017