THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 02:44:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-495-2465
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KUN TIAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tian (CPSO#: 111249 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-495-2465
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KUN TIAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tian (CPSO#: 111249 )
Business Address: 76 Grenville St
Toronto ON M5S 1B2
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KUN TIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KUN TIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2017