THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/04/25 23:32:19 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Waterloo Ave
Guelph ON N1H 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18442642993
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GURNAAM KASBIA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kasbia (CPSO#: 111280 )
Business Address: 80 Waterloo Ave
Guelph ON N1H 0A1
1-844-264-2993

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Waterloo Ave
Guelph ON N1H 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18442642993
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. GURNAAM KASBIA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kasbia (CPSO#: 111280 )
Business Address: 80 Waterloo Ave
Guelph ON N1H 0A1
1-844-264-2993

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURNAAM INDERJE KASBIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASBIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURNAAM INDERJE KASBIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASBIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2017