THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:02:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Westway Medical Clinic
4-1723 Kipling Ave
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 748-8011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rutherford Medical Clinic
3-5283 Rutherford Rd
Vaughan Ontario L4L 2T2
Phone: (905) 264-8311
Fax: 905-264-0801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nourian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nourian (CPSO#: 111289 )
Business Address: 1723 Kipling Avenue
Suite 2G
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
(647) 774-8011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Westway Medical Clinic
4-1723 Kipling Ave
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 748-8011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rutherford Medical Clinic
3-5283 Rutherford Rd
Vaughan Ontario L4L 2T2
Phone: (905) 264-8311
Fax: 905-264-0801

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nourian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nourian (CPSO#: 111289 )
Business Address: 1723 Kipling Avenue
Suite 2G
Etobicoke Ontario M9R 4E1
(647) 774-8011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEJMAN NOURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOURIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PEJMAN NOURIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOURIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2016