THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:09:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 405-2115 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3N 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-741-2456
Fax: 416-741-2454
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicola Berman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Berman (CPSO#: 111303 )
Business Address: 405-2115 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3N 2V6
416 741 2456

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 405-2115 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3N 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-741-2456
Fax: 416-741-2454
Address: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Oct 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicola Berman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Berman (CPSO#: 111303 )
Business Address: 405-2115 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3N 2V6
416 741 2456

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLA KIM BERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLA KIM BERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Jan 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2017