THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:55:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
Family Medicine
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3418 County Rd 36 S
Pinecrest Nursing Home
Bobcaygeon ON K0M 1A0
Phone: 7057382366
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough General Hospital
Orthopedic Surgery
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rishi Ramdass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ramdass (CPSO#: 111315 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough General Hospital
Department of Orthopedic Surgery
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
Family Medicine
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-461-8272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3418 County Rd 36 S
Pinecrest Nursing Home
Bobcaygeon ON K0M 1A0
Phone: 7057382366
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough General Hospital
Orthopedic Surgery
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rishi Ramdass Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ramdass (CPSO#: 111315 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Toronto Ontario M4J 5C2
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough General Hospital
Department of Orthopedic Surgery
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RISHI RAMSOHOYE RAMDASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMDASS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RISHI RAMSOHOYE RAMDASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMDASS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2017