THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 17:35:30 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mosul, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 436 Hazeldean Rd
Hazeldean Medical Clinic
Suite 203
Kanata ON K2L 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 369-8330
Fax: (613) 836-6882

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karam R.A. Alchalabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alchalabi (CPSO#: 110956 ) Dr. E. Thanon (CPSO#: 111326 )
Business Address: 436 Hazeldean Road
Suite 203
Ottawa Ontario K2L 1T9
613 369 8330
Business Address: 329 March Rd
Kanata ON K2K 2E1
6134357730

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Mosul, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 436 Hazeldean Rd
Hazeldean Medical Clinic
Suite 203
Kanata ON K2L 1T9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 369-8330
Fax: (613) 836-6882

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karam R.A. Alchalabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alchalabi (CPSO#: 110956 ) Dr. E. Thanon (CPSO#: 111326 )
Business Address: 436 Hazeldean Road
Suite 203
Ottawa Ontario K2L 1T9
613 369 8330
Business Address: 329 March Rd
Kanata ON K2K 2E1
6134357730

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENAS AHMED THANON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THANON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ENAS AHMED THANON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THANON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mosul, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2017