THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:56:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Garden Medical Center
L5 - 372 Taunton Road East
Whitby Ontario L1R 0H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pickering First Place Med. Clinic
Unit 11,1550 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saud Mirza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mirza (CPSO#: 111375 )
Business Address: L5-372 Tauton Road East
Whitby Ontario L1R 0H4
(905) 655-0655

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Garden Medical Center
L5 - 372 Taunton Road East
Whitby Ontario L1R 0H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Pickering First Place Med. Clinic
Unit 11,1550 Kingston Road
Pickering Ontario L1V 1C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saud Mirza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mirza (CPSO#: 111375 )
Business Address: L5-372 Tauton Road East
Whitby Ontario L1R 0H4
(905) 655-0655

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAUD MIRZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAUD MIRZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2021
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 28 Sep 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2017