THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:50:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140 Oxford St E
Suite 407
London ON N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 548-488-2602
Fax: 226-667-6769
Address: 1-130 Thompson Rd
Clinic
London ON N5Z 2Y6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-140 Oxford St E
London ON N6A 5R9
Phone: 519-850-3800
Fax: 519-850-5099
Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
London ON N6H 5L4
Phone: (519)- 601-8621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NNAEMEKA UKWUOMA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ukwuoma (CPSO#: 111382 )
Business Address: 120 Wellington St
St Thomas ON N5R 2R4
519-633-9200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 140 Oxford St E
Suite 407
London ON N6A 5R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 548-488-2602
Fax: 226-667-6769
Address: 1-130 Thompson Rd
Clinic
London ON N5Z 2Y6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-140 Oxford St E
London ON N6A 5R9
Phone: 519-850-3800
Fax: 519-850-5099
Address: 990 Gainsborough Rd
London ON N6H 5L4
Phone: (519)- 601-8621
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Aug 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NNAEMEKA UKWUOMA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ukwuoma (CPSO#: 111382 )
Business Address: 120 Wellington St
St Thomas ON N5R 2R4
519-633-9200

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NNAEMEKA UKWUOMA may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NNAEMEKA UKWUOMA may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2017