THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:46:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-1605 Blvd Orléans
Unit 3A
Orléans ON K1C 7E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138418500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2645 Innes Rd
Gloucester ON K1B 3J7
Phone: 613-7378899
Extension: 74430
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Ashar Ayub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ayub (CPSO#: 111392 )
Business Address: 3-1605 Blvd Orléans
Orléans ON K1C 7E2
Business Address: Orleans Family Health Clinic
110 - 210 Centrum Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1E 3V7
(613) 837-5454

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-1605 Blvd Orléans
Unit 3A
Orléans ON K1C 7E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138418500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2645 Innes Rd
Gloucester ON K1B 3J7
Phone: 613-7378899
Extension: 74430
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Feb 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Ashar Ayub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ayub (CPSO#: 111392 )
Business Address: 3-1605 Blvd Orléans
Orléans ON K1C 7E2
Business Address: Orleans Family Health Clinic
110 - 210 Centrum Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1E 3V7
(613) 837-5454

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ASHAR AYUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYUB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD ASHAR AYUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AYUB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2017