THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:47:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Spring Street
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132568598
Fax: 6137300070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Matei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Matei (CPSO#: 111400 )
Business Address: 95 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
6132568598

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Spring Street
Mississippi Mills Ontario K0A 1A0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132568598
Fax: 6137300070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Matei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Matei (CPSO#: 111400 )
Business Address: 95 Spring St
Almonte ON K0A 1A0
6132568598

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANCA MATEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATEI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANCA MATEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATEI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2017