THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:47:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University Hassan II - Ain Chok, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-2430 Bank St
Southbank Healthcare Centre
Ottawa ON K1V 0T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 736-6946
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fatima Zohra Jabbar Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jabbar (CPSO#: 111408 )
Business Address: Southbank Healthcare Centre
Suite 3
2430 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0T7
(613) 736-6946

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University Hassan II - Ain Chok, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3-2430 Bank St
Southbank Healthcare Centre
Ottawa ON K1V 0T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 736-6946
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fatima Zohra Jabbar Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jabbar (CPSO#: 111408 )
Business Address: Southbank Healthcare Centre
Suite 3
2430 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 0T7
(613) 736-6946

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATIMA ZOHRA JABBAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABBAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATIMA ZOHRA JABBAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABBAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University Hassan II - Ain Chok, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2017