THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Monash University, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 7756
Fax: 416-586-3216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 May 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sebastian Hobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hobson (CPSO#: 111410 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
Toronto ON M5G 1X5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Monash University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
600 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 7756
Fax: 416-586-3216

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 May 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sebastian Hobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hobson (CPSO#: 111410 )
Business Address: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynecology
Toronto ON M5G 1X5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Sep 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SEBASTIAN RUPERT HOBSON may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and gynecology and maternal fetal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SEBASTIAN RUPERT HOBSON may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and gynecology and maternal fetal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Monash University, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Sep 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Apr 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Apr 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2017