THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:18:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue, Room 8-917
OPG Building
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4991
Fax: (416) 586-4654
Address: 76 Grenville Street | Room 5449
University of Toronto - Women's Col
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7744
Fax: (416) 323-6237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 27 Jan 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nucelio Lemos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lemos (CPSO#: 111421 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
8-917 - 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 4991
Business Address: University of Toronto
Women's College
5449 - 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400 Extn: 4166

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue, Room 8-917
OPG Building
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 4991
Fax: (416) 586-4654
Address: 76 Grenville Street | Room 5449
University of Toronto - Women's Col
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: 416-323-7744
Fax: (416) 323-6237

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 27 Jan 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nucelio Lemos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lemos (CPSO#: 111421 )
Business Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
8-917 - 700 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1Z5
(416) 586-4800 Extn: 4991
Business Address: University of Toronto
Women's College
5449 - 76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
(416) 323-6400 Extn: 4166

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Jun 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 18 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NUCELIO LUIZ DE BARROS MOREIRA LEMOS may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and gynecology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NUCELIO LUIZ DE BARROS MOREIRA LEMOS may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and gynecology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Jun 2024
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 17 Mar 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2017