THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:43:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 407-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 350 2080
Fax: 647 350 2081
Address: 3018 Don Mills Rd
Peanut Plaza
Rainbow IDA Pharmacy
North York ON M2J 3C1
Phone: 647 350 2080
Fax: 647 350 2081

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suswapna Singh Rawat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rawat (CPSO#: 111424 )
Business Address: Suite 401
4800 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Address: Whitby Medical Arts Centre
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
(905) 436-2273
Business Address: 407-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
6473502080

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 407-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 350 2080
Fax: 647 350 2081
Address: 3018 Don Mills Rd
Peanut Plaza
Rainbow IDA Pharmacy
North York ON M2J 3C1
Phone: 647 350 2080
Fax: 647 350 2081

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suswapna Singh Rawat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rawat (CPSO#: 111424 )
Business Address: Suite 401
4800 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Address: Whitby Medical Arts Centre
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
(905) 436-2273
Business Address: 407-4800 Leslie St
North York ON M2J 2K9
6473502080

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSWAPNA SINGH RAWAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSWAPNA SINGH RAWAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gandhi Medical College, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2017