THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:09:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Isfahan University, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York City Center Medical Clin
130-5 Park Home Ave
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M2N 6L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-551-2023
Fax: 833-251-6565
Address: Norrh York Cosmetic Clinic
Unit 103
80 Finch Ave. West
North York Ontario M2N2H4
Phone: 6473589622
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4256 Bathurst St.
North York Ontario M3H5Y8
Phone: 6473527188
Fax: 6473527190
Address: Whitby Urgent Care
1615 Dundas St E,
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
Phone: 905-436-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Majlessi Koupaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Majlessi Koupaei (CPSO#: 111430 )
Business Address: 130-5 Park Home Ave
North York ON M2N 6L4
416-551-2023
Business Address: Suite 100
4256 Bathurst Street
North York Ontario M3H 5Y8
Business Address: Suite 103
80 Finch West Street
North York Ontario M2N 2H4
Business Address: Whitby Medical Arts
204-1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
(905) 436-2273

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Isfahan University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York City Center Medical Clin
130-5 Park Home Ave
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M2N 6L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-551-2023
Fax: 833-251-6565
Address: Norrh York Cosmetic Clinic
Unit 103
80 Finch Ave. West
North York Ontario M2N2H4
Phone: 6473589622
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4256 Bathurst St.
North York Ontario M3H5Y8
Phone: 6473527188
Fax: 6473527190
Address: Whitby Urgent Care
1615 Dundas St E,
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
Phone: 905-436-2273
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Majlessi Koupaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Majlessi Koupaei (CPSO#: 111430 )
Business Address: 130-5 Park Home Ave
North York ON M2N 6L4
416-551-2023
Business Address: Suite 100
4256 Bathurst Street
North York Ontario M3H 5Y8
Business Address: Suite 103
80 Finch West Street
North York Ontario M2N 2H4
Business Address: Whitby Medical Arts
204-1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby Ontario L1N 2L1
(905) 436-2273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMIDREZA MAJLESSI KOUPAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJLESSI KOUPAEI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HAMIDREZA MAJLESSI KOUPAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJLESSI KOUPAEI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Isfahan University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2017