THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gauhati University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-2430 Don Reid Dr
205
Ottawa ON K1H 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139089039
Fax: 613 445 3030

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. DUTTA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dutta (CPSO#: 111431 )
Business Address: 212 Helen Rapp Way
Business Address: 1935 Bank St
Business Address: 1935 Bank St

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Gauhati University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-2430 Don Reid Dr
205
Ottawa ON K1H 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6139089039
Fax: 613 445 3030

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. DUTTA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Dutta (CPSO#: 111431 )
Business Address: 212 Helen Rapp Way
Business Address: 1935 Bank St
Business Address: 1935 Bank St

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRASANNAJIT DUTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUTTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRASANNAJIT DUTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUTTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gauhati University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2017