THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, KACHCHI, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Planned Parenthood Toronto
36 Prince Arthur Ave
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-961-0113
Fax: 416-961-9856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rahima Alani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Alani (CPSO#: 111443 )
Business Address: Planned Parenthood Toronto
36B Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
(416) 961-0113
Business Address: Victoria Medical Group
205-1719 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1R 2X7
(416) 609-1100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, KACHCHI, SPANISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Planned Parenthood Toronto
36 Prince Arthur Ave
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-961-0113
Fax: 416-961-9856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rahima Alani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Alani (CPSO#: 111443 )
Business Address: Planned Parenthood Toronto
36B Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
(416) 961-0113
Business Address: Victoria Medical Group
205-1719 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1R 2X7
(416) 609-1100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHIMA ALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAHIMA ALANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2017