THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk Medical Centre
Suite 308A
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 744-1785
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4278 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2P 2G5
Phone: 2264763186
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leanne Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Martin (CPSO#: 111453 )
Business Address: Suite 308A
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 744-1785

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk Medical Centre
Suite 308A
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 744-1785
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4278 King Street East
Kitchener Ontario N2P 2G5
Phone: 2264763186
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leanne Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Martin (CPSO#: 111453 )
Business Address: Suite 308A
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 744-1785

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEANNE BRIDGET MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEANNE BRIDGET MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 2017