THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:41:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Medical Oncology
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 06 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHUN CHEONG TSUI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tsui (CPSO#: 111462 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
905-494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Medical Oncology
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 06 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 06 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHUN CHEONG TSUI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tsui (CPSO#: 111462 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
905-494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHUN CHEONG TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHUN CHEONG TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2017