THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:48:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bochner Eye Institute
40 Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 960-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Retina Institue
6 Marginn Mews
North York Ontario M3C 0G9
Phone: 4164493937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 353 Iroquois Shore Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 1M3
Phone: (905) 815-1112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2941 Lawrence Ave E
Bochner Eye Institute
Scarborough ON M1P 2V6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Gilani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gilani (CPSO#: 111470 )
Business Address: 350 Rutherford Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 4N6
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: 240 Alton Towers Circle
Suite 300
Scarborough Ontario M1V 3Z3
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: A5 - 9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: 6 Marginn Mews
North York Ontario M3C 0G3
(416) 449-3937
Business Address: Bochner Eye Institute
40 Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
(416) 960-2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bochner Eye Institute
40 Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 960-2020
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Retina Institue
6 Marginn Mews
North York Ontario M3C 0G9
Phone: 4164493937
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 353 Iroquois Shore Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 1M3
Phone: (905) 815-1112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2941 Lawrence Ave E
Bochner Eye Institute
Scarborough ON M1P 2V6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 03 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Gilani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Gilani (CPSO#: 111470 )
Business Address: 350 Rutherford Road South
Brampton Ontario L6W 4N6
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: 240 Alton Towers Circle
Suite 300
Scarborough Ontario M1V 3Z3
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: A5 - 9135 Keele Street
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0J4
(416) 663-3937
Business Address: 6 Marginn Mews
North York Ontario M3C 0G3
(416) 449-3937
Business Address: Bochner Eye Institute
40 Prince Arthur Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5R 1A9
(416) 960-2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATIMAH GILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FATIMAH GILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2017