THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:48:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9022938591
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 33 Drummond Street West
Perth Ontario K7H 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9022938591
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHELSEY LAYNE KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHELSEY LAYNE KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2017