THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:27:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bundelkhand University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Church Street
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
Care
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 549 3181
Fax: 705 549 3446
Address: 170 Colborne St West
Soldier's Memorial Hospital
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Achal Mishra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mishra (CPSO#: 111504 )
Business Address: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
(705) 549-3181
Business Address: 170 Colborne St W
Soldier's Memorial Hospital
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Bundelkhand University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 500 Church Street
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
Care
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 549 3181
Fax: 705 549 3446
Address: 170 Colborne St West
Soldier's Memorial Hospital
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 13 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Achal Mishra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mishra (CPSO#: 111504 )
Business Address: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
(705) 549-3181
Business Address: 170 Colborne St W
Soldier's Memorial Hospital
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ACHAL MISHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISHRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ACHAL MISHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISHRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bundelkhand University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2017