THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:59:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166035853
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHERIF YOUSSEF MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Youssef (CPSO#: 111512 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166035853
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: 416-586-4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SHERIF YOUSSEF MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Youssef (CPSO#: 111512 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERIF YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERIF YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2017