THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:29:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Hospital Center
Division of Plastic Surgery
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1(905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 362 Fairlawn Ave
Edelstein Cosmetic
North York ON M5M 1T6
Phone: 4162565614
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NAYIF ALNAIF MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alnaif (CPSO#: 111520 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Division of Plastic Surgery
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Address: 2920 Dufferin St
Suite 202
North York ON M6B 3S8
Business Address: 362 Fairlawn Ave
Edelstein Cosmetic
North York ON M5M 1T6
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Hospital Center
Division of Plastic Surgery
Brampton ON L6R 3J7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Hospital Center
Division of Plastic Surgery
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1(905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 362 Fairlawn Ave
Edelstein Cosmetic
North York ON M5M 1T6
Phone: 4162565614
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. NAYIF ALNAIF MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alnaif (CPSO#: 111520 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Division of Plastic Surgery
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Address: 2920 Dufferin St
Suite 202
North York ON M6B 3S8
Business Address: 362 Fairlawn Ave
Edelstein Cosmetic
North York ON M5M 1T6
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
William Osler Hospital Center
Division of Plastic Surgery
Brampton ON L6R 3J7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAYIF MOHAMMED S ALNAIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNAIF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAYIF MOHAMMED S ALNAIF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNAIF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2017