THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:21:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-696-7000
Extension: 14414
Fax: 613-696-7127

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lawrence K.H. Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lau (CPSO#: 111523 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
6136967000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-696-7000
Extension: 14414
Fax: 613-696-7127

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa Heart Institute Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lawrence K.H. Lau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Lau (CPSO#: 111523 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
6136967000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE KHERR HSIEN LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAWRENCE KHERR HSIEN LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2017