THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 403-1100 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 403, 1100 Sheppard Ave East
North York ON M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-0660
Fax: 416-222-9238
Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: 9053726811
Extension: 3050
Fax: 905 373 6972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JASON AN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. An (CPSO#: 111561 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 403-1100 Sheppard Ave E
Suite 403, 1100 Sheppard Ave East
North York ON M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-0660
Fax: 416-222-9238
Address: 1000 Depalma Drive
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Phone: 9053726811
Extension: 3050
Fax: 905 373 6972

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JASON AN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. An (CPSO#: 111561 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZHENG-HUNG JASON AN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZHENG-HUNG JASON AN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2017