THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:19:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137484916
Fax: 6137484975
Address: 353 Pitt St
Cornwall ON K6J 3R1
Phone: 613-861-5000
Fax: 613-714-1287

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Gregoire Leduc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leduc (CPSO#: 111590 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613-748-4916

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137484916
Fax: 6137484975
Address: 353 Pitt St
Cornwall ON K6J 3R1
Phone: 613-861-5000
Fax: 613-714-1287

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Gregoire Leduc Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Leduc (CPSO#: 111590 )
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
613-748-4916

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-GREGOIRE LEDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDUC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-GREGOIRE LEDUC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEDUC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2017