THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 505-27 Roncesvalles Ave
Toronto ON M6R 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476574033
Fax: 6474177044

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bennett (CPSO#: 111592 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 505-27 Roncesvalles Ave
Toronto ON M6R 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6476574033
Fax: 6474177044

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Bennett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bennett (CPSO#: 111592 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW STEVEN BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW STEVEN BENNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENNETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2017