THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:31:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053784647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amit Raut Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raut (CPSO#: 111629 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053784647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amit Raut Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raut (CPSO#: 111629 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIT RAUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAUT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMIT RAUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAUT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 May 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017