THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:40:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Zambia, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300-2200 Dundas St E
Telemed MD
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 18883502323
Fax: 18334790224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jedrin Ngungu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ngungu (CPSO#: 111630 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
5196858500 Extn: 55412

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Zambia, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 300-2200 Dundas St E
Telemed MD
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 18883502323
Fax: 18334790224

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jedrin Ngungu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ngungu (CPSO#: 111630 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
5196858500 Extn: 55412

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Apr 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 17 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JEDRIN NGUNGU may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JEDRIN NGUNGU may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Zambia, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Apr 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2017