THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:44:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Oak Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166315028
Fax: 4163610334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Barreto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Barreto (CPSO#: 111636 )
Business Address: 726 Bloor St W
Suite 208
Toronto ON M6G 4A1
4165353164

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Oak Street
Toronto Ontario M5A 0A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166315028
Fax: 4163610334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Barreto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Barreto (CPSO#: 111636 )
Business Address: 726 Bloor St W
Suite 208
Toronto ON M6G 4A1
4165353164

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROHIT BARRETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROHIT BARRETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2017