THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:36:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room E524
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4011
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Truong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Truong (CPSO#: 111647 )
Business Address: Suite 432
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room E524
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4011
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Truong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Truong (CPSO#: 111647 )
Business Address: Suite 432
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRA TRUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRA TRUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2017