THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:52:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 566 Louise St,
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137742420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MATTHEW MCNEVIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McNevin (CPSO#: 111687 )
Business Address: 19 George Street
Russell Ontario K4R 1B9
5142371593

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 566 Louise St,
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137742420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MATTHEW MCNEVIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McNevin (CPSO#: 111687 )
Business Address: 19 George Street
Russell Ontario K4R 1B9
5142371593

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES MCNEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEVIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES MCNEVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEVIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2017