THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:33:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3560 Bathurst St
North York ON M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167852500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 148 Parkdale Ave N
Hamilton ON L8H 5X2
Phone: 2899487705
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 12-1525 Bristol Rd W
Mississauga ON L5M 4Z1
Phone: 9058125555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SARMAD AL-SHAMAA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Shamaa (CPSO#: 111689 )
Business Address: 3560 Bathurst St
North York ON M6A 2E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3560 Bathurst St
North York ON M6A 2E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167852500
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 148 Parkdale Ave N
Hamilton ON L8H 5X2
Phone: 2899487705
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 12-1525 Bristol Rd W
Mississauga ON L5M 4Z1
Phone: 9058125555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SARMAD AL-SHAMAA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Al-Shamaa (CPSO#: 111689 )
Business Address: 3560 Bathurst St
North York ON M6A 2E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARMAD JAFAR SHAKER AL-SHAMAA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAMAA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARMAD JAFAR SHAKER AL-SHAMAA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SHAMAA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017