THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:16:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Plains Road East
Burlington Ontario L7T 2E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 635-7313
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. J. Harrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Harrison (CPSO#: 111723 )
Business Address: 309-1580 Merivale Rd
Nepean ON K2G 4B5
613 226 4030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 501 Plains Road East
Burlington Ontario L7T 2E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 635-7313
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. J. Harrison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Harrison (CPSO#: 111723 )
Business Address: 309-1580 Merivale Rd
Nepean ON K2G 4B5
613 226 4030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRITTANY JADE HARRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRISON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRITTANY JADE HARRISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARRISON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017