THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 94 Fanshawe Park Rd E
Unit 5A
London ON N5X 4C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196677081
Fax: 5196610083

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AYESHA MOHAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mohar (CPSO#: 111732 )
Business Address: 94 Fanshawe Park Road East
London Ontario N5X 4C5
5196677081

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 94 Fanshawe Park Rd E
Unit 5A
London ON N5X 4C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196677081
Fax: 5196610083

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AYESHA MOHAR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mohar (CPSO#: 111732 )
Business Address: 94 Fanshawe Park Road East
London Ontario N5X 4C5
5196677081

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYESHA INTSAR MOHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYESHA INTSAR MOHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017