THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 16:24:29 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Magna Health Centre
375 Magna Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 7L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 726-7470
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: 705-324-6111
Extension: 3170
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fatima Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali (CPSO#: 116744 ) Dr. R. Ali (CPSO#: 111741 )
Business Address: 10376 Yonge Street
Unit 108
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3B8
Business Address: Magna Health Centre
375 Magna Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 7L6
(905) 726-7470

Corporation Name: Rizwan Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali (CPSO#: 116744 ) Dr. R. Ali (CPSO#: 111741 )
Business Address: Magna Health Centre
375 Magna Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 7L6
(905) 726-7470

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Magna Health Centre
375 Magna Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 7L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 726-7470
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: 705-324-6111
Extension: 3170
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Alexandra Hospital
LOCATION: Ingersoll

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fatima Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali (CPSO#: 116744 ) Dr. R. Ali (CPSO#: 111741 )
Business Address: 10376 Yonge Street
Unit 108
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3B8
Business Address: Magna Health Centre
375 Magna Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 7L6
(905) 726-7470

Corporation Name: Rizwan Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ali (CPSO#: 116744 ) Dr. R. Ali (CPSO#: 111741 )
Business Address: Magna Health Centre
375 Magna Drive
Aurora Ontario L4G 7L6
(905) 726-7470

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Apr 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 24 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rizwan Ali may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rizwan Ali may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow Medical College, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2017
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2017