THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:53:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Gesamthochschule Essen, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Ave
1 PMB-275
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 6085
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Apr 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 25 Apr 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Veit-Haibach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Veit-Haibach (CPSO#: 111742 )
Business Address: 263 McCaul Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1W7
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6085
Business Address: 102 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Z2
Business Address: 585 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2N2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: Gesamthochschule Essen, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Ave
1 PMB-275
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Extension: 6085
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Apr 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 25 Apr 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Veit-Haibach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Veit-Haibach (CPSO#: 111742 )
Business Address: 263 McCaul Street
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5T 1W7
(416) 340-4800 Extn: 6085
Business Address: 102 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Z2
Business Address: 585 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 2N2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 May 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 16 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PATRICK VEIT-HAIBACH may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology and Nuclear Medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PATRICK VEIT-HAIBACH may practise medicine independently in Diagnostic Radiology and Nuclear Medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Gesamthochschule Essen, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 May 2024
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Nov 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 May 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2017