THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:09:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RAVI B DOOBAY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Doobay (CPSO#: 111747 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON L3P 7P3
905-472-7373

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058954521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: RAVI B DOOBAY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Doobay (CPSO#: 111747 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Address: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON L3P 7P3
905-472-7373

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVI BUDHENDRA DOOBAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOBAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAVI BUDHENDRA DOOBAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOOBAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 May 2017
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 May 2017