THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:35:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar M.Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate Oakville, ON, L6
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 8452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammad Shaltaf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shaltaf (CPSO#: 111749 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar M.Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate Oakville, ON, L6
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 8452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammad Shaltaf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shaltaf (CPSO#: 111749 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD MAHMOUD ABDEL-RAHMAN SHALTAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHALTAF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD MAHMOUD ABDEL-RAHMAN SHALTAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHALTAF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2017
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2017